U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-bk-11659
  • Case Name: Marcus Geraine Kilbreath and Darla Ann Kilbreath
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order Confirming Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Sell]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Submit]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Ordr on Motion to Shorten Time]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Shorten Time]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Sell]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.