U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11053
  • Case Name: Blue Star Drywall LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Order on Motion for Relief from Stay]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Order on Motion for Relief from Stay]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Order and Negative Notice (Chambers Only)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Order and Negative Notice (Chambers Only)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Relief from Stay (Motion)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Relief from Stay (Motion)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Tr7)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Tr7)]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.