U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11052
  • Case Name: Etta M. Kelley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.