U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:24-bk-72089
  • Case Name: Benny A. Wolfe
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Compensation 13]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Motion to Extend Time]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Service (Misc Menu)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Response to Motion/Document]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Extend Time]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.