U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-70540
  • Case Name: Zackery Keith and Taylor Keith
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Misc Menu)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order of Deficiency]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.