U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-70536
  • Case Name: Kristi L. Bailey
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Vacate / Set Aside]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Cancelled Hearing or Meeting]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Dismissing Case]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Credit Counseling Not Filed]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order of Deficiency]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Social Security Number (Form 121)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Voluntary Petition (Ch. 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.