U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11060
  • Case Name: Karen Denise Kenzel
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Reviewed and Approved (CHAMBERS ONLY EVENT)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Continue Meeting of Creditors (Motion)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.