U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-bk-71736
  • Case Name: Americo T Guidotti and Heather Guidotti
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order for Relief from Stay]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Misc Menu)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Modify Plan (Tr 13)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing Not Held (Courtroom)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service (Ch 13)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of Amended Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Entered]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Withdrawing Objection (Tr 13)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.