U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-70209
  • Case Name: Jason Aaron Mann
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Reaff]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Extend / Enlarge Time to File Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Misc Menu)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order on Motion to be Relieved]
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Relieved]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.