U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11072
  • Case Name: Thomas Eran Ghormley
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion for Relief from Stay]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order and Negative Notice (Chambers Only)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order and Negative Notice (Chambers Only)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Relief from Stay (Motion)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Service (Ch 13)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Misc Menu)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order of Deficiency]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.