U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-11069
  • Case Name: Leighann Howard
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Notice of Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors with Notice of Successor Trustee]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Notice Appointing Successor Trustee]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Appointment Declination (Tr 7)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - case upload]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition - case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.