U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:24-bk-13512
  • Case Name: David Hatfield
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Order on Application to Employ by Trustee]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Employ (Tr 7 Motion)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Notice of Assets]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Request for Notice of Assets (Meeting Held)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.