U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-11081
  • Case Name: Jovita Luttrull
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.