U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11077
  • Case Name: James Ralph Blythe and Rebecca Jo Blythe
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Misc Menu)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions (Tr 13)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.