U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:25-bk-70549
  • Case Name: Daniel Carr and Felice Partida
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 13)]
  • May 15, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order of Deficiency]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Receipt (Auto)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 6 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.