U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-70547
  • Case Name: Travis Upchurch
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting Continued]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Statement of Current Monthly Income Ch 13 (Form 122C)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 13)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Submit]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Final Payment in FULL]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order of Deficiency]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.