U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:23-ap-07029
  • Case Name: Sokora v. Ross
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [Memorandum of Returned Mail (AP)]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
  • April 22, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [Order to Submit]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: ap Office: 6 Chapter: Trustee: Cox, Richard L. [Dismiss Adversary Proceeding]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.