U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11097
  • Case Name: Tarsua Belanda Barbee
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting Continued]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 13)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Service (Ch 13)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice (only) of Opportunity to Object/Respond to Plan]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Cure Deficiencies]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.