U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-bk-72068
  • Case Name: Melissa Maria Fincher
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of Modified Plan]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Motion to Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.