U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11109
  • Case Name: Mariano Nicholas Reed
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Creditor Request for Notice (batch)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Reviewed and Approved (CHAMBERS ONLY EVENT)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.