U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11108
  • Case Name: Joshua Austin Vincent
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 7)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order to Submit]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order on Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.