U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-11118
  • Case Name: John Lee Walling, Jr. and Michelle Le Walling
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions (Tr 13)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Change of Address (Misc Menu)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Misc Menu)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Opportunity to Object/Respond]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.