U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11114
  • Case Name: Millie Adams Knott and Noel Lee Knott
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Trustee Services Rendered Pursuant to 330(e)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.