U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11129
  • Case Name: Walter Ray Terry
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • May 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Service (Ch 13)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting Continued]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 13)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Motion to Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Case Change]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.