U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Herrera-Munoz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 10, 2025: [Substitute Attorney]
  • April 09, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 07, 2025: [Order]
  • April 07, 2025: [Pretrial Discovery Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Appointing Interpreter]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.