U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:24-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buck
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 26, 2025: [Order]
  • April 26, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 25, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Protective Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 17, 2025: [In Limine]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
  • April 08, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order]
  • April 04, 2025: [Quash]
  • April 04, 2025: [Victim Rights]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.