U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11141
  • Case Name: Theresa Marie Harvill
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order on Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.