U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-bk-13702
  • Case Name: Melissa Dawn Jamison
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Objection to Motion/Document]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Text Order Waiving 30-Day Hearing Requirement]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Relief from Stay (Motion)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Confirming Modified Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.