U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-70582
  • Case Name: Ricky Earl Traylor, Sr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting Continued]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 13)]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.