U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11153
  • Case Name: Lawrence G. McDowell, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Case Change]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.