U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-11151
  • Case Name: Doris Jane Golatt
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Notice of Change of Address (Misc Menu)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.