U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11164
  • Case Name: Erica Ashmore and Steven Ashmore
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 13)]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Convert Case 13 to 11]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Misc Menu)]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Case Change]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.