U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-70588
  • Case Name: Julie Marie Kelly
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan by Trustee]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Revoke Payroll Deduction (Tr 13)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.