U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:25-bk-70587
  • Case Name: Haley Breanna Posey
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Reviewed and Approved (CHAMBERS ONLY EVENT)]
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Reaffirmation Agreement]
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order and Notice of Conversion]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order Re: Deconsolidation]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Rice, M. Randy [Order on Motion to Sever / Split / Deconsolidate Chapter 13 Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.