U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-10683
  • Case Name: Tomika Conway
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Service (Ch 13)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting Continued]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Amd/Cnt/Reschd Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Continued (Tr 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.