U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-10120
  • Case Name: Nathan G. Hotchkiss and Emily O. Hotchkiss
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Transfer of Claim]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.