U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:23-bk-11187
  • Case Name: Rosie Jenkins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Compensation 13]
April, 2025
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order Withdrawing Motion to Dismiss Upon Conditions]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Amended Order]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Motion to Borrow / Incur]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Borrow / Incur]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.