U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11191
  • Case Name: Janet D Young
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Held (Tr 13)]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Extend / Enlarge Time to Pay Filing Fee]
  • May 13, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • May 12, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Extend / Enlarge Time to Pay Filing Fee]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Motion to Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Submit]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.