U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11220
  • Case Name: Bridget Chloree MacKenzie
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Memorandum of Document Deficiency]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education (Court)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Order (Generic)]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Order on Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Credit Counseling Not Filed]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Objection to Motion/Document]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [In Forma Pauperis/Waive Ch 7 Filing Fee]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Social Security Number (Form 121)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Bond, Stanley [Voluntary Petition (Ch 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.