U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11219
  • Case Name: Natasha Sampson and Marcus Sampson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Chapter 7 Final Payment in FULL]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Order on Application to Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Application / Motion)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Ferguson, J. Brian [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.