U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-11243
  • Case Name: Ellen McKnight
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Motion to Dismiss Case (UST)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Exigent Circumstances re: Credit Counseling (Court)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [In Forma Pauperis/Waive Ch 7 Filing Fee]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Social Security Number (Form 121)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Voluntary Petition (Ch 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.