U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-bk-70615
  • Case Name: Bryan Douglas Chisom and Tina Kathryn Chisom
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Compensation 13]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Service]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
April, 2025
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Creditor Request for Notice]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.