U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-11249
  • Case Name: Stacy Lynn Mustin and Steven Michael Mustin
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.