U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11252
  • Case Name: Peggy Massey
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order on Compensation 13]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Objection to Confirmation of the Plan]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Certificate of Service (Ch 13)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: McCarty, Mark T. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.