U.S. Federal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:25-bk-70623
  • Case Name: Rival Commercial RE LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order to Submit]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Extend Deadline to File Schedules]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Misc Menu)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (UST)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Request for Claims Bar Date - Ch 11 Debtor ONLY]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Employ (Motion)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.