U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11269
  • Case Name: Kanisha Larry-Lee
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order on Motion to Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order to Pay Trustee (Tr 13)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [DEFICIENT Schedules Filed (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 13)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Chapter 13 Plan]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Notice of Case Change]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Extend Automatic Stay]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Compensation-Ch. 13 ONLY]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Gooding, Jack W. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Babin, Joyce Bradley [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Ch 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.