U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-11267
  • Case Name: Larsena Michelle Wilborn
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Financial Management Course - Debtor Education]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Notice of Change of Address (Misc Menu)]
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Notice of Rescheduled Meeting of Creditors with Notice of Successor Trustee]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Notice Appointing Successor Trustee]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Appointment Declination (Tr 7)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Appointment Declination (Tr 7)]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Mitchell, Hamilton M [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Credit Counseling Certificate]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.