U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-bk-11264
  • Case Name: NLC Products Inc.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • May 04, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order (Generic)]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Application to Employ]
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion to Pay]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing ]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employ (Motion)]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Memorandum of Document Deficiency]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Amended Petition, Schs, Stmts or Creditors (Excludes Plan, Credit Counseling)(Ch 11)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order Due]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Objection to Motion/Document]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order on Motion To Limit Notice]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Limit Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Approval]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Continuation of Utility Service]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Use Cash Collateral]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Pay ]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Employ (Motion)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Notice of Attorney's Appearance and Request for Notice (Ntc Menu)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Corporate Resolution]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 (UST)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Order of Deficiency]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Receipt (Auto)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.