U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:25-cr-50030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Welch
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 28, 2025: [Bond]
  • April 28, 2025: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 28, 2025: [Information - Felony]
  • April 28, 2025: [Citation Calendar]
  • April 28, 2025: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • April 25, 2025: [Pretrial Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order Setting Change of Plea Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.