U.S. Federal Court Records for the Eastern District of Arkansas

arkansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-bk-10245
  • Case Name: Iesha Hassell
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Order Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Personal Financial Mgt Course Certificate]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Reviewed and Approved (CHAMBERS ONLY EVENT)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [BNC Certificate of Mailing]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Owens, Lance [Notice of Requirement to Complete Course in Financial Management]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.